TX HB2463 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the deposit and allocation of certain funds to the horse industry escrow account and to the maximum balance of that account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the deposit and allocation of certain funds to the horse industry escrow account and to the maximum balance of that account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1808 (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1324 (Y: 91 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1808
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21SenateAmended
2019-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1324
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-09HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Middleton
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-Geren
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1998 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2463
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02463I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02463H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02463E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02463S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02463F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2463&RcdVtNo=1324&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=101
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=102
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2463&RcdVtNo=1808&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019

Bill Comments

feedback