TX HB2463 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring state agencies to develop written succession plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring state agencies to develop written succession plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#843 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HousePassed
2017-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-04HouseAmended
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-19HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback