TX HB2460 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the board of commissioners of the Port of Beaumont Navigation District of Jefferson County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the board of commissioners of the Port of Beaumont Navigation District of Jefferson County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-20HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Texas Ports, Innovation & Infrastructure, Select
2017-04-04HouseCorrection in referral
2017-03-31HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-02-27HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback