TX HB2459 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration of violations and administrative penalties of the employment of children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of violations and administrative penalties of the employment of children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#524 (Y: 128 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12 Effective on 9/1/23
2023-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2023-05-17SenateRecord vote
2023-05-17SenatePassed
2023-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-17SenateRecord vote
2023-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2023-05-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-16SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2023-05-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-05-08SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2023-05-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-04-27SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2023-04-27SenateRead first time
2023-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2023-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2023-04-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-26HouseRecord vote RV#524
2023-04-26HousePassed
2023-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-25HousePassed to engrossment
2023-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-04-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-13HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2023-03-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2459
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02459I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02459H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02459E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02459S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02459F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02459I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB02459H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02459E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB02459E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2459&RcdVtNo=524&Ch=H&Dt=04/26/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-17-F1.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments

feedback