TX HB2441 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the imposition and collection of fines, fees, and court costs in criminal cases.
Title
Relating to the imposition and collection of fines, fees, and court costs in criminal cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-07 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1373 |
2021-05-03 | House | Postponed 5/7/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-04-28 | House | Postponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local