TX HB2435 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of the home or residence address of a state or federal judge or the judge's spouse in certain government records and documents.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of the home or residence address of a state or federal judge or the judge's spouse in certain government records and documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB73 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Open Records
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Courts--Judges
Open Records
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses