TX HB2434 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring certain public retirement systems to take certain actions or implement certain plans designed to achieve actuarial soundness.
Title
Relating to requiring certain public retirement systems to take certain actions or implement certain plans designed to achieve actuarial soundness.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-17 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Political Subdivisions
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--County & District
Retirement Systems--Judicial
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Political Subdivisions
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--County & District
Retirement Systems--Judicial
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD