TX HB2431 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the participation of public state colleges in the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the participation of public state colleges in the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective immediately
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-22HouseRead first time
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback