TX HB2429 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the persons who may consent to the medical care or immunization of a child.
Title
Relating to the persons who may consent to the medical care or immunization of a child.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-01 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2015-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONSERVATORSHIP
Family
Family--Parent & Child
GUARDIANS & WARDS
IMMUNIZATIONS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PARENTAL CONSENT
Family
Family--Parent & Child
GUARDIANS & WARDS
IMMUNIZATIONS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PARENTAL CONSENT