TX HB2423 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the broadband office within the Public Utility Commission of Texas and the establishment of a broadband service investment grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the broadband office within the Public Utility Commission of Texas and the establishment of a broadband service investment grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#698 (Y: 122 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 2nd time RV#648 (Y: 123 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#698
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#648
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1103 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback