TX HB242 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-6)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability for the donation and distribution of feminine hygiene products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability for the donation and distribution of feminine hygiene products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24 Effective on 9/1/23
2023-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-11HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-11HouseSenate passage reported
2023-05-11SenateRecord vote
2023-05-11SenatePassed
2023-05-11SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-11SenateRecord vote
2023-05-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2023-05-11SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2023-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2023-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-05SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-05SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-05-04SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-04-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2023-04-13SenateRead first time
2023-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2023-04-11HouseReported engrossed
2023-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#132
2023-04-11HousePassed
2023-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-10HousePassed to engrossment
2023-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-03-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-03-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-03-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-03-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-02-23HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2023-02-23HouseRead first time
2022-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB242
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00242I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00242H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00242E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00242S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00242F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00242I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB00242H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00242E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB00242E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB242&RcdVtNo=132&Ch=H&Dt=04/11/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-11-F.PDF#page=16

Bill Comments

feedback