TX HB2414 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to participation by certain state employees in a default investment product under a deferred compensation plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to participation by certain state employees in a default investment product under a deferred compensation plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback