TX HB2410 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a request for a nursing peer review committee determination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a request for a nursing peer review committee determination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1036 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1036
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback