TX HB241 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to substituted service of citation through a social media presence.
Title
Relating to substituted service of citation through a social media presence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
PROCESS SERVERS
SUPREME COURT
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
PROCESS SERVERS
SUPREME COURT