TX HB2409 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#931 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-05HouseAmended
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-22HouseRead first time
2017-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback