TX HB2408 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of information in ad valorem tax appraisal records that identifies the home address of certain judges.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of information in ad valorem tax appraisal records that identifies the home address of certain judges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-09 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-08 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2013-05-08 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Judges
Open Records
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Judges
Open Records
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous