TX HB2408 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to title insurance.
Title
Relating to title insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Sen. Chris Harris [R] | Rep. Aaron Pena [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-23 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
PUBLIC NOTICE
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
PUBLIC NOTICE