TX HB2406 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to service retirement benefits payable by the Employees Retirement System of Texas to commissioned peace officers employed by the attorney general.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to service retirement benefits payable by the Employees Retirement System of Texas to commissioned peace officers employed by the attorney general.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-13HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2023-03-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2072 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Co-author authorized
SB2072 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback