TX HB2404 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and maintenance of a database of information regarding certain local economic development agreements; providing a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and maintenance of a database of information regarding certain local economic development agreements; providing a civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1243 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#98 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-03 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-18SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-18HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1243
2021-05-18HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-14HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-14HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-14HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-14SenateRecord vote
2021-05-14SenatePassed
2021-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-14SenateRecord vote
2021-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-12SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-04-12SenateRead first time
2021-04-08SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-07HouseRecord vote RV#98
2021-04-07HousePassed
2021-04-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-06HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-06HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-04-06HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Slaton
2021-04-06HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-16HouseRead first time
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2404
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02404I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02404E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02404S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02404F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02404H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02404I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02404H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02404E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02404E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02404S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02404S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02404F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2404&RcdVtNo=98&Ch=H&Dt=04/07/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-14-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2404&RcdVtNo=1243&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments

feedback