TX HB24 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing criminal penalties for certain family violence offenses committed when a child is or may be present during the commission of the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing criminal penalties for certain family violence offenses committed when a child is or may be present during the commission of the offense.

Sponsors

Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]
Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]
Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Amended RV#1071 (Y: 127 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1030 (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1071
2019-05-07HousePassed as amended
2019-05-07HouseAmended 1-Romero
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#1030
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback