TX HB24 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the salary paid to certain professional employees of public schools; making an appropriation.
Title
Relating to the salary paid to certain professional employees of public schools; making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Salaries & Expenses
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Salaries & Expenses
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations