TX HB2399 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of a biometric identity verification device to verify the age of an individual purchasing an alcoholic beverage.
Title
Relating to the use of a biometric identity verification device to verify the age of an individual purchasing an alcoholic beverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1767 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce