TX HB2398 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration and collection of sales and use taxes and certain fees applicable to sales involving marketplace providers.
Title
Relating to the administration and collection of sales and use taxes and certain fees applicable to sales involving marketplace providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#143 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#143 |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB477 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - See remarks for effective date