TX HB2393 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-08 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to State Bar of Texas elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to State Bar of Texas elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-21HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-21HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB891 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback