TX HB2392 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the persons entitled to redeem property after the foreclosure of a property owners' association's assessment lien.
Title
Relating to the persons entitled to redeem property after the foreclosure of a property owners' association's assessment lien.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-03-24 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-16 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2121 (Similar To) 2009-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
FORECLOSURES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property