TX HB2388 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing inmates with certain documents on release or discharge; changing a fee.
Title
Relating to providing inmates with certain documents on release or discharge; changing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses