TX HB2387 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to suits to collect past due property owners' association assessments.
Title
Relating to suits to collect past due property owners' association assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-31 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |