TX HB2387 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of utilization review, independent review, and peer review for health benefit plan and workers' compensation coverage and to preauthorization of certain medical care and health care services by certain health benefit plan issuers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of utilization review, independent review, and peer review for health benefit plan and workers' compensation coverage and to preauthorization of certain medical care and health care services by certain health benefit plan issuers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - Amended RV#786 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#786
2019-04-30HousePassed as amended
2019-04-30HouseAmended 1-G. Bonnen
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-29HouseAmended 2-J.E. Johnson
2019-04-29HouseAmended 1-G. Bonnen
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1187 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback