TX HB2386 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Senate passage reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to volunteer firefighter supervision of outdoor burning of waste consisting of plant growth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to volunteer firefighter supervision of outdoor burning of waste consisting of plant growth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - HB 2386 Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseRules suspended
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-05HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2017-03-20HouseRead first time
2017-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback