TX HB2381 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the sales and use tax to certain insurance services.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the sales and use tax to certain insurance services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-05 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |