TX HB2381 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to disclosure of the prices charged to state agencies in connection with pharmacy benefit manager services.
Title
Relating to disclosure of the prices charged to state agencies in connection with pharmacy benefit manager services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB704 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Health
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
Insurance
Insurance--Public Employees
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
Insurance
Insurance--Public Employees
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions