TX HB2380 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to participation by videoconference at informal proceedings of the Texas Medical Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to participation by videoconference at informal proceedings of the Texas Medical Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-30HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback