TX HB2371 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the evaluation of applications for certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to the evaluation of applications for certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-21 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |