TX HB2366 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 75-8)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to criminal conduct that endangers law enforcement; creating a criminal offense and increasing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to criminal conduct that endangers law enforcement; creating a criminal offense and increasing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors

Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]
Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]
Rep. James White [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#597 (Y: 119 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-24HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#597
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2366
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02366I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02366H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02366E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02366S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02366F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02366I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02366H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02366E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02366E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2366&RcdVtNo=597&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=22

Bill Comments

feedback