TX HB2363 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to export fees charged by the Middle Pecos Groundwater Conservation District; changing a fee.
Title
Relating to export fees charged by the Middle Pecos Groundwater Conservation District; changing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MIDDLE PECOS GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2363 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02363I.htm |