TX HB2362 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Record vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the standard of proof in health care liability claims involving emergency medical care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the standard of proof in health care liability claims involving emergency medical care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1107 (Y: 107 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-14SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1107
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-08HousePostponed 5/8/19 11:15 AM
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-07HouseAmended 1-Moody
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2378 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback