TX HB2362 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the standard of proof in health care liability claims involving emergency medical care.
Title
Relating to the standard of proof in health care liability claims involving emergency medical care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1107 (Y: 107 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1107 (Y: 107 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1107 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 11:15 AM |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 1-Moody |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2378 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Malpractice
Malpractice--Professionals
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Malpractice
Malpractice--Professionals