TX HB2358 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the exemption from certain registration and licensing requirements and taxes for certain businesses and employees who enter this state in response to a disaster or emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the exemption from certain registration and licensing requirements and taxes for certain businesses and employees who enter this state in response to a disaster or emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-16 Effective immediately
2015-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-22SenateRecord vote
2015-05-22SenatePassed
2015-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-22SenateRecord vote
2015-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2015-05-06SenateRead first time
2015-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-04HouseRecord vote
2015-05-04HousePassed
2015-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-01HouseAmended
2015-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-20HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2015-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-13HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2015-03-13HouseRead first time
2015-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback