TX HB2345 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to definitions for purposes of gambling criminal offenses and the prosecution of the criminal offenses of gambling, gambling promotion, and keeping a gambling place.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to definitions for purposes of gambling criminal offenses and the prosecution of the criminal offenses of gambling, gambling promotion, and keeping a gambling place.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1015 (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2023-05-09SenateRead first time
2023-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2023-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#1015
2023-05-04HousePassed
2023-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2023-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2023-03-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1681 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs
SB1681 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs
SB1680 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback