TX HB2345 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-11)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Institute for a Disaster Resilient Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Institute for a Disaster Resilient Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1873 (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#289 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#267 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1873
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-11HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#289
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#267
2019-04-10HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2345
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02345I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02345H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02345E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02345S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02345F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2345&RcdVtNo=267&Ch=H&Dt=04/10/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2345&RcdVtNo=289&Ch=H&Dt=04/11/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2345&RcdVtNo=1873&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=125

Bill Comments

feedback