TX HB2345 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the performance and appeal of utilization review by and under the direction of physicians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the performance and appeal of utilization review by and under the direction of physicians.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-10HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-04-10HouseCorrection in referral
2017-03-20HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-20HouseRead first time
2017-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback