TX HB2340 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the practice of therapeutic optometry; requiring an occupational certificate to perform certain surgical procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the practice of therapeutic optometry; requiring an occupational certificate to perform certain surgical procedures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB993 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Sent to the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback