TX HB234 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the local regulation of the sale of lemonade or other beverages by children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the local regulation of the sale of lemonade or other beverages by children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1981 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#58 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1981
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-22SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-22SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-22SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-22HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-22HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-22HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-27SenateRead first time
2019-03-21SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-20HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-20HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20HouseRecord vote RV#58
2019-03-20HousePassed
2019-03-20HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-19HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-19HouseAmended 1-Middleton
2019-03-19HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB824 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB234
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00234I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00234H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00234E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00234S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00234F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB234&RcdVtNo=58&Ch=H&Dt=03/20/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-15-F1.PDF#page=1
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB234&RcdVtNo=1981&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=23

Bill Comments

feedback