TX HB2330 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-14)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study of an intake system and state case management system for state and federal disaster assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study of an intake system and state case management system for state and federal disaster assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#287 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective immediately
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-11HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#287
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback