TX HB2327 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Postponed 6/1/21 8:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Postponed 6/1/21 8:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for operating a watercraft while intoxicated with a child passenger; changing the eligibility for deferred adjudication community supervision.
Title
Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for operating a watercraft while intoxicated with a child passenger; changing the eligibility for deferred adjudication community supervision.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Postponed 6/1/21 8:00 AM |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOATS & BOATING
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Water Safety
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Water Safety
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID