TX HB2326 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the possession and transportation of certain nonindigenous snakes; increasing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the possession and transportation of certain nonindigenous snakes; increasing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1343 (Y: 117 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1343
2021-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-19HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-19HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-26SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-04-26SenateRereferred to committee
2021-04-20SenateReferred to Administration
2021-04-20SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#297
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-07HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB840 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2326
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02326I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02326S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02326F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02326I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02326H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02326E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02326E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02326S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02326S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02326F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2326&RcdVtNo=297&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2326&RcdVtNo=1343&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback