TX HB2324 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation of a health care provider participation program by the Tarrant County Hospital District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation of a health care provider participation program by the Tarrant County Hospital District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-21 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-10HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-09HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-08HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HouseRecord vote RV#320
2019-04-12HousePassed
2019-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-06HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1061 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback