TX HB2317 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to criminal history record information by an emergency communication district.
Title
Relating to access to criminal history record information by an emergency communication district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Political Subdivisions
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Political Subdivisions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2317 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02317I.htm |