TX HB2314 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers of and election to the board of directors of the Nacogdoches County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the powers of and election to the board of directors of the Nacogdoches County Hospital District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#417 |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
NACOGDOCHES COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital