TX HB2310 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the county clerk to conduct a marriage ceremony and collect a related fee; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to authorizing the county clerk to conduct a marriage ceremony and collect a related fee; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
MARRIAGE CEREMONIES
County Government--Employees/Officers
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
MARRIAGE CEREMONIES
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2310 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02310I.htm |